EP0669563 - Tubular frame with integral air duct for an electrographic machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegel, Robert P. 52 Woodside Drive Penfield, NY 14526 / US | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/35] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95301239.0 | 27.02.1995 | [1995/35] | Priority number, date | US19940203127 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: US 203127 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0669563 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0669563 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669563 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/20, F28F1/00, H05K7/20 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
G03G21/206 (EP,US);
H05K7/20009 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | G03G21/20, F28F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/35] | Title | German: | Rohrförmiges Gestell mit integrierter Luftleitung für elektrographisches Gerät | [1995/35] | English: | Tubular frame with integral air duct for an electrographic machine | [1995/35] | French: | Cadre tubulaire avec conduite d'air intégrée pour un appareil électrographique | [1995/35] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02287377 ; | [Y]US5028959 (GOORAY ARTHUR M [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH0333762 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910213), vol. 015, no. 059, Database accession no. (P - 1165), & JP02287377 A 19901127 (CANON INC) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910425), vol. 015, no. 166, Database accession no. (P - 1195), & JP03033762 A 19910214 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1-4,7 * abstract * |