Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0674443

EP0674443 - Start code detector for image sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES
2355 Main Street Suite 200
Irvine, CA 92714 / US
[1995/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Wise, Adrian Philip
10 Westbourne Cottages
Frenchay, Bristol BS16 1NA / GB
02 / Sotheran, Martin William
The Ridings, Wick Lane, Stinchcombe
Dursley, Gloucestershire GL11 6BD / GB
03 / Robbins, William Philip
19 Springhill
Cam, Gloucestershire GL11 5PE / GB
04 / Finch, Helen Rosemary
Tyley, Coombe
Wotton-Under-Edge, Gloucester. GL12 7ND / GB
05 / Boyd, Kevin James
21 Lancashire Road
Bristol BS7 9DL / GB
[1995/39]
Representative(s)Vuillermoz, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras
"Le Contemporain"
50, Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Vuillermoz, Bruno , et al
Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz
69131 Ecully Cédex / FR
Former [1997/43]Vuillermoz, Bruno
Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz
69131 Ecully Cédex / FR
Former [1995/39]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date95301301.828.02.1995
[1995/39]
Priority number, dateGB1994000591424.03.1994         Original published format: GB 9405914
[1995/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0674443
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0674443
Date:23.12.1998
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0674443
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Former [1996/02]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP0674443
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[1996/02]
[1998/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, G06F13/00, G06F9/38
[1998/10]
Former International [1995/39]H04N7/24, G06F7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/39]
TitleGerman:Detektor für den Startcode von Bildsequenzen[1995/39]
English:Start code detector for image sequences[1995/39]
French:Détecteur de code de départ pour séquences d'images[1995/39]
Examination procedure13.10.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
08.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
08.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
03.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2000Fee for grant paid
12.10.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98202132.1  / EP0884910
EP98202133.9  / EP0891088
EP98202134.7  / EP0897244
EP98202135.4  / EP0901286
EP98202149.5  / EP0891089
EP98202154.5   Application withdrawn  : 18.08.1998
EP98202166.9  / EP0901287
EP98202170.1  / EP0896473
EP98202171.9  / EP0896474
EP98202172.7  / EP0896475
EP98202174.3  / EP0896476
EP98202175.0  / EP0896477
Opposition(s)12.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.05.2001
BE09.05.2001
CH09.05.2001
IT09.05.2001
LI09.05.2001
NL09.05.2001
[2008/06]
Former [2003/08]AT09.05.2001
BE09.05.2001
CH09.05.2001
LI09.05.2001
NL09.05.2001
Former [2002/15]AT09.05.2001
BE09.05.2001
CH09.05.2001
LI09.05.2001
Former [2002/14]AT09.05.2001
BE09.05.2001
Former [2002/12]BE09.05.2001
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9425935  (ARRAY MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,59,66 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0602621  (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 17 * figures 12,15,20,23 *;
 [XAY]EP0576749  (PIONEER DIGITAL DESIGN CENTRE [GB]) [X] 1,2,66-73,54-58 * the whole document * [A] 64 [Y] 3-16,23-39;
 [YAX]EP0572766  (IBM [US]) [Y] 3-16,23-53 * the whole document * [A] 66-73,59-63 [X] 54-58;
 [AYX]EP0506294  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-16,59-63,65,74,75,23-39 * the whole document * [Y] 40-53 [X] 17-22;
 [XA]GB2269070  (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 59-62 * the whole document * [A] 63,74,75;
 [A]US4622585  (REITSMA JOGCHUM [NL]) [A] 17-22 * figure 8 *;
 [A]US5173695  (SUN MING-TING [US], et al) [A] 40-47 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0572263  (C CUBE MICROSYSTEMS [US]) [A] 40-47 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0288219  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 40-47 * abstract *;
 [A]US4823201  (SIMON ALLEN H [US], et al) [A] 40-47 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0551672  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 51 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0460751  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 65 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0577329  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 65 * abstract *;
 [A]US5253053  (CHU KE-CHIANG [US], et al) [A] 74,75 * the whole document *;
 [A]  KUN-MIN YANG ET AL, "VLSI ARCHITECTURE DESIGN OF A VERSATILE VARIABLE LENGTH DECODING CHIP FOR REAL-TIME VIDEO CODECS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE REGION 10 CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATI SYSTEMS (TENCON), HONG KONG, 24 - 27 SEPT., 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19900924), vol. 2, pages 551 - 554, XP000235934 [A] 40-47,74,75 * the whole document *
 [A]  KOMORI S ET AL, "AN ELASTIC PIPELINE MECHANISM BY SELF-TIMED CIRCUITS", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (198802), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 111 - 117, XP000051576

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.266
 [A]  KAORU UCHIDA ET AL, "A PIPELINED DATAFLOW DATAFLOW PROCESSOR ARCHITECTURE BASED ON A VARIABLE LENGTH TOKEN CONCEPT", ARCHITECTURE, UNIVERSITY PARK, AUG. 15 - 19, 1988, BRIGGS F A, (19880815), vol. 1, pages 209 - 216, XP000079309
 [A]  TOKUMICHI MURAKAMI ET AL, "A DSP ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN FOR LOW BIT-RATE MOTION VIDEO CODEC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (19891001), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 1267 - 1274, XP000085313

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/31.44342
 [A]  ELLIOTT J A ET AL, "REAL-TIME SIMULATION OF VIDEOPHONE IMAGE CODING ALGORITHMS ON RECONFIGURABLE MULTICOMPUTERS", IEE PROCEEDINGS E. COMPUTERS & DIGITAL TECHNIQUES, (19920501), vol. 139, no. 3 PART E, pages 269 - 279, XP000306411
 [A]  MAYER A C, "THE ARCHITECTURE OF A SINGLE-CHIP PROCESSOR ARRAY FOR VIDEOCOMPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, ROSEMONT, JUNE 8 - 10, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930608), no. CONF. 12, page 294/295, XP000427624
 [A]  YONG M CHONG, "A DATA-FLOW ARCHITECTURE FOR DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING", WESCON CONFERENCE RECORD, (19840101), pages 4/6 1 - 4/6 10, XP000565437