Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0671454

EP0671454 - Process for removal of heteroatoms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township
Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US
Former [1995/37]For all designated states
EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue
Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Siskin, Michael
56 Shonghum Road
Randolph, NJ 07869 / US
02 / Ferrughelli, David Thomas
10 Hardy Drive
Flemington, NJ 08822 / US
03 / Katritzky, Alan Roy
1221 S.W. 21st Avenue
Gainesville, FL 32601 / US
04 / Olmstead, William Neergaard
200 Gallinson Drive
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[1995/37]
Representative(s)Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Dew, Melvyn John , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [1995/37]Fletcher Watts, Susan J. , et al
ESSO Engineering (Europe) Limited, Patents and Licences, Mailpoint 72, Esso House, Ermyn Way
Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB
Application number, filing date95301452.907.03.1995
[1995/37]
Priority number, dateUS1994021260709.03.1994         Original published format: US 212607
[1995/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0671454
Date:13.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0671454
Date:21.08.1996
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0671454
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:C10G1/06, C07C1/32, C10G1/00
[1996/32]
Former International [1995/37]C10G1/06, C07C1/32
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Entfernung von Heteroatomen[1995/37]
English:Process for removal of heteroatoms[1995/37]
French:Procédé pour l'élimination d'hétéroatomes[1995/37]
Examination procedure27.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/13]
14.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2000Fee for grant paid
17.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4968414  (DELBIANCO ALBERTO [IT], et al) [AD] 1 * example 1 *;
 [A]  A.R. KATRIZKY ET AL, ENERGY & FUELS, (1992), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 439 - 450, XP000196098 [A] 1,7,8 * table XII *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef00034a013
 [AD]  M. SISKIN ET AL, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1993), vol. 34, no. 30, pages 4739 - 4742, XP002004898 [AD] 1,7,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)74076-7
 [AD]  J.J. CUMMINS ET AL, ENERGY COMMUNICATIONS, (1980), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 117 - 135, XP002004899 [AD] 1 * tables 2,3 *
 [A]  DATABASE CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1990:591127, XP002004901
    [] NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1990), vol. 7, pages 777 - 788,
 [PX]  M. SISKIN ET AL, ENERGY & FUELS, (1995), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 331 - 343, XP002004900 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ef00050a019