blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0671845


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.02.2006 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
08.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
27.04.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2001 [2001/24]
23.03.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.05.2001 [2001/19]
31.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  17.05.2000 [2000/20]
22.03.2000 Renewal fee
30.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
23.03.1999 Renewal fee
12.02.1999 Change - classification published on  31.03.1999 [1999/13]
12.02.1999 Change - classification published on  31.03.1999 [1999/13]
12.02.1999 Change - German title published on  31.03.1999 [1999/13]
25.01.1999 Examination report or reply
04.12.1998 Examination report or reply
24.07.1998 First examination report
22.07.1998 Examination report or reply
18.03.1998 Renewal fee
20.03.1997 Renewal fee
08.11.1996 Request for examination filed published on  27.12.1996 [1996/52]
13.09.1996 Publication of search report published on  30.10.1996 [1996/44]
06.09.1996 Change - classification published on  23.10.1996 [1996/43]
28.07.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.09.1995 [1995/37]