blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0671845

Designated contracting states DELapse: 18.08.2000
 FRLapse: 17.05.2000
 GB 
Examination procedure19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted17.05.2000
Opposition procedure20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 09.05.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.09.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:30.10.1996 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:27.12.1996 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19961030
 
Event date:09.09.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980727
 
Event date:17.05.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000517
 
Event date:17.05.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:21.06.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69516923
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000621
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:18.08.2000 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20000818
 
Event date:13.10.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:09.05.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:13.03.2002 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20020313
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:10.03.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20030310
 
Event date:29.10.2003 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20030310