Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0671845

EP0671845 - Multi-dimensional image data compression and decompression [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/37]Multi-dimensional image compression and decompression method
[1999/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Victor Company of Japan, Limited
12, Moriya-Cho 3-chome Kanagawa-Ku Yokohama-Shi
Kanagawa-Ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/37]For all designated states
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN LIMITED
12, Moriya-Cho 3-chome Kanagawa-Ku
Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa-Ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawauchi, Masayo
6-8-33, Oh-Machi
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Hozumi, Yoshiko
1-6-3-202, Numama
Zushi-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Shimizu, Kyoichi
1-48-13, Ohoka, Minami-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1995/37]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/37]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date95301576.510.03.1995
[1995/37]
Priority number, dateJP1994006788212.03.1994         Original published format: JP 6788294
[1995/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0671845
Date:13.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0671845
Date:30.10.1996
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0671845
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/41, H04N7/26
[1996/43]
Former International [1995/37]H04N1/41
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/37]
TitleGerman:Datenreduktion und -expansion für mehrdimensionale Bilder[1999/13]
English:Multi-dimensional image data compression and decompression[1999/13]
French:Compression et décompression de données d'images multidimensionnelles[1999/13]
Former [1995/37]Verfahren zum Komprimierung und Dekomprimierung multidimensionaler Bilder
Former [1995/37]Multi-dimensional image compression and decompression method
Former [1995/37]Procédé de compression et de décompression d'images multidimensionnelles
Examination procedure30.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
27.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1999Fee for grant paid
19.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.05.2000
DE18.08.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/13]DE18.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/24]FR13.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0164825  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 12, line 8 - page 13, line 10 * * page 17, line 20 - page 19, line 14 * [Y] 2,3,5;
 [X]US4189711  (FRANK AMALIE J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 61 *;
 [Y]JPH05167998  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al) [Y] 2;
 [PY]US5333012  (SINGHAL SHARAD [US], et al) [PY] 2 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 34 *;
 [Y]JPH02263277  (RICOH KK) [Y] 3,5;
 [PY]US5357602  (OHTA JUNICHI [JP]) [PY] 3,5 * column 4, line 2 - line 30 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 2; claim 5 *
 [Y]  M. NAKAJIMA ET AL., "A Coding Method of Gray-Valued Pictures Using Density Contour Lines", SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, (198507), vol. 16, no. 4, pages 29 - 36, XP000568685 [Y] 3,5 * page 29, column R, paragraph 2 - page 31, column L, paragraph 4 *