Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684133

EP0684133 - Lithographic printing members for use with laser irradiation imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/48]Lithographic printing members for use with laser-discharge imaging apparatus
[1999/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PRESSTEK, INC.
8 Commercial Street
Hudson, NH 03051 / US
[1995/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Nowak, Michael T.
70 Regina Drive
Leominster, Massachusetts / US
02 / Lewis, Thomas E.
27 Pilgrim Circle
E. Hampstead, New Hampshire 03826 / US
03 / Holley, Leonard
4163 Camp Betty Hasting Road
Walkertown, North Carolina 28105 / US
[1995/48]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]Mounteney, Simon James
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95301868.621.03.1995
[1995/48]
Priority number, dateUS1994024701620.05.1994         Original published format: US 247016
[1995/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0684133
Date:29.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684133
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:B41C1/10
[1995/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/48]
TitleGerman:Flachdruckplatten zur Bebilderung mittels Laserbestrahlung[1999/01]
English:Lithographic printing members for use with laser irradiation imaging apparatus[1999/01]
French:Plaques lithographiques pour emploi dans un appareil pour produire des images par irradiation au laser[1999/01]
Former [1995/48]Flachdruckplatten zur Bebilderung mittels Lasererosion
Former [1995/48]Lithographic printing members for use with laser-discharge imaging apparatus
Former [1995/48]Plaques lithographiques pour emploi dans un appareil pour produire des images par érosion au laser
Examination procedure26.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/21]
20.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
03.09.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:04.09.1998Request for further processing filed
03.09.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.10.1998Decision despatched
03.09.1998Request for further processing filed
03.09.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
06.10.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
ES19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/50]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
IE21.03.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0580393  (PRESSTEK INC) [X] 1-15 * page 16, line 32 *;
 [A]JPH04314578
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930319), vol. 017, no. 136, Database accession no. (M - 1384), & JP04314578 A 19921105 (SHIYACHIHATA KOUGIYOU KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0644047
other   - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (198004), vol. 019, no. 201