Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0675141

EP0675141 - Copolymer compositions containing hydroxyl functional (meth)acrylates and hydroxyalkyl carbamate (meth)acrylates and mixtures thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/23]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Former [1995/40]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Argyropoulos, John Nicholas
35 Michael Street
Scot Depot 25560, West Virginia / US
02 / Busby, Molly I-Chin
130 Whispering Woods Road
Charleston 25304, West Virginia / US
03 / Lewis, Jeffrey Michael Owen
29746 Briarton
Framington Hills 48331, Michigan / US
[1995/40]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/04]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [1995/40]Allard, Susan Joyce , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date95302149.030.03.1995
[1995/40]
Priority number, dateUS1994022072131.03.1994         Original published format: US 220721
[1995/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0675141
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0675141
Date:03.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0675141
Date:29.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/36, // (C08F220/36, 220:28)
[1995/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/40]
TitleGerman:Copolymerzusammensetzungen enthaltend (Meth)Acrylate mit Hydroxylfunktion und (Meth)Acrylate von Hydroxyalkylcarbamaten und Mischungen hiervon[1995/40]
English:Copolymer compositions containing hydroxyl functional (meth)acrylates and hydroxyalkyl carbamate (meth)acrylates and mixtures thereof[1995/40]
French:Compositions de copolymères comprenant des (méth)acrylates à fonction hydroxylique et (méth)acrylates de hydroxyalkylcarbamates et mélanges de ceux-ci[1995/40]
Examination procedure06.04.1995Examination requested  [1995/40]
11.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.12.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1998Fee for grant paid
12.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
polypatent
Postfach 40 02 43
51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  02.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Corp.
3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive
New Jersey 07828/1234 / US
Opponent's representative
Münch, Volker
Dres. Fitzner & Münch
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1999/21]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  02.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Corp.
3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive
New Jersey 07828/1234 / US
Opponent's representative
Münch, Volker, Dr.
Dres. Fitzner & M nch Rechts- und Patentanw lte Lintorfer Strasse 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [1999/17]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 02  03.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Corp.
3000 Continental Drive North Mount Olive
New Jersey 07828/1234 / US
Former [1999/16]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.1999  15.03.1999  ADMISSIBLE
PPG Industries, Inc.
One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, Pa.15272 / US
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
12.04.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.10.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.03.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.02.2004Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.05.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.07.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.05.2001Appeal received No.  T0566/01
23.07.2001Statement of grounds filed
10.02.2004Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.02.2004Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3840448  (OSBORN ET AL.) [X] 1,5-10;
 [X]US4165266  (STUEBEN ET AL.) [X] 1,5-10;
 [A]US3479328  (NORDSTROM) [A] 1-10
OppositionWO9410211
 WO9410212
 WO9410213