Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0675141 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0675141



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 542
19.08.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.08.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.08.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
18.08.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Claims Opposition 4
29.07.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
29.07.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
28.07.2004 Claims Opposition 3
28.07.2004 Claims Opposition 4
28.07.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
03.05.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
03.05.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
21.04.2004 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Opposition 1
05.04.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
20.02.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
16.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.01.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.12.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.12.2003 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 3
07.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.09.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.09.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
05.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
31.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.07.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
12.12.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
10.12.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2001 Claims Appeal 4
05.12.2001 Claims Appeal 4
05.12.2001 Claims Appeal 4
05.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
05.10.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.07.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.07.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.07.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
30.05.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.05.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.05.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.05.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
23.05.2001 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.03.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.03.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
14.03.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
14.03.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
14.03.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
14.03.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
14.03.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.03.2001 Text intended for grant Opposition 17
10.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
09.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.01.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.01.2001 Claims Opposition 4
04.01.2001 Claims Opposition 4
04.01.2001 Description Opposition 10
04.01.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.01.2001 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
22.04.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.04.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.04.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.04.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.04.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.04.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.04.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
10.04.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.04.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.04.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
29.03.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.03.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.10.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
12.10.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.10.1999 Claims Opposition 4
12.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
19.08.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
19.08.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.08.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.04.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.03.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.03.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
04.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
04.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
03.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
03.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
02.03.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
02.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
02.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
02.03.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.04.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.02.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.02.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.02.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.12.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.11.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.07.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
27.06.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
11.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.03.1996 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.07.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.07.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
30.03.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.03.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
30.03.1995 Description Search / examination 31
30.03.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.03.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 42
30.03.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
22.07.1992 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
27.12.1990 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4