Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0685776

EP0685776 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mita Industrial Co., Ltd.
2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku
Osaka 540 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]For all designated states
MITA INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku
Osaka 540 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Nariaki, c/o Mita Industrial Co., Ltd.
2-28 Tamatsukuri
1-Chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 540 / JP
[1995/49]
Representative(s)Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M.
Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M.
HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [1995/49]Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date95302480.913.04.1995
[1995/49]
Priority number, dateJP1994011932231.05.1994         Original published format: JP 11932294
[1995/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0685776
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0685776
Date:19.02.1997
[1997/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0685776
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/08
[1995/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/49]
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsgerät[1995/49]
English:Image forming apparatus[1995/49]
French:Appareil de formation d'images[1995/49]
Examination procedure12.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/41]
06.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.1999Fee for grant paid
27.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR05.01.2000
Former [2001/09]FR02.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH03188459  ;
 [A]JPS5624383  ;
 [A]US4974964  (YOSHIHARA TOSHIYUKI ET AL) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]US4392737  (NISHIKAWA MASAJI) [A] 1,2,5 * column A *;
 [A]EP0467609  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 16 - line 48; figures 2-4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911114), vol. 015, no. 449, Database accession no. (P - 1275), & JP03188459 A 19910816 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810521), vol. 005, no. 077, Database accession no. (P - 062), & JP56024383 A 19810307 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *