Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684585

EP0684585 - Image forming method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshino, Takahiro, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Tamura, Hideyuki, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Katayama, Akihiro, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Yamamoto, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Tanaka, Koichiro, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1995/48]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date95302680.421.04.1995
[1995/48]
Priority number, dateJP1994010785322.04.1994         Original published format: JP 10785394
JP1994010785422.04.1994         Original published format: JP 10785494
JP1994010785522.04.1994         Original published format: JP 10785594
[1995/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0684585
Date:29.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0684585
Date:17.04.1996
[1996/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684585
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06T15/00, G06T7/00
[1996/16]
Former International [1995/48]G06T15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/48]
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsverfahren und -gerät[1995/48]
English:Image forming method and apparatus[1995/48]
French:Méthode et appareil de formation d'images[1995/48]
Examination procedure29.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/44]
30.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
05.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
05.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2002Fee for grant paid
13.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Request for further processing for:05.08.2002Request for further processing filed
05.08.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.08.2002Decision despatched
03.01.2001Request for further processing filed
03.01.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.02.2003
NL05.02.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2003/41]NL05.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2244621  (EUROP VISION SYSTEMS CENTRE LT [GB]) [A] 1,5-11,13-24,27-37,41-52,55-63 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 11 * * page 9, line 5 - page 14, line 9 * * page 16, line 16 - page 20, line 8 *
 [A]  - AGUI E.A., "AN IN-BETWEENING METHOD OF GRAY-VALUED IMAGES USING DENSITY CONTOUR LINES", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, NEW YORK US, vol. 17, no. 2, pages 89 - 96, XP001375174 [A] 1-63 * the whole document *