Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0741217

EP0741217 - Insertion tool for dry fixing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/45]Dry fixing system
[2001/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HELIFIX LIMITED
21 Warple Way
London W3 0RX / GB
[2002/02]
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
HELIFIX LIMITED
Third Floor Suite, 54 Uxbridge Road
London W12 8LP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Paterson, Robert Ian
71 Ravenscourt Road
London W6 0UJ / GB
02 / Breeze, Brian Alan
12 Bath Close, Battle Hill Estate
Wallsend, Tyne & Wear NE28 9DZ / GB
[1996/45]
Representative(s)Butler, Michael John , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/16]Butler, Michael John , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1996/45]Rees, David Christopher , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date95302978.202.05.1995
[1996/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0741217
Date:06.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0741217
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:E04G23/02, B25F3/00, B25D17/00, F16B15/06
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/45]
TitleGerman:Einschlagwerkzeug für Trocken-Befestigungssystem[2001/33]
English:Insertion tool for dry fixing system[2001/33]
French:Outil d'insertion pour système de fixation à sec[2001/33]
Former [1996/45]Trocken-Befestigungsverfahren
Former [1996/45]Dry fixing system
Former [1996/45]Système de fixation à sec
Examination procedure07.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
18.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2002Fee for grant paid
01.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.04.2002Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP00118727.7  / EP1057948
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2262560  (KNIGHT KEITH [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 2 - page 6; figure - *;
 [A]EP0494723  (OLLIS WILLIAM JOHN BERNARD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1 - column 5, line 21; figure - *;
 [A]GB2280927  (ITW LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,4,11,12 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]BE840070  (COOPMAN) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4140492  (NEUMANN RITA [DE]) [A] 1,5,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2213420  (LANKRY JULIEN JEAN LOUIS) [A] 1,5,8 * page 3, line 12 - page 6; figure - *;
 [A]US2657383  (SIERING ROBERT L, et al);
 [A]US4218795  (ERNST RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]EP0426918  (GIANNUZZI LOUIS [US])
otherEP0171250
 EP0150906
 US5687801
    - "HELIFIX STAINLES STEEL RETROFIT WALL TIE SYSTEM", ANNOUNCEMENT HELIFIX STAINLESS STEEL, XX, XX, XX, (19000101), pages 01 - 04, XP002909199
    - "Overseas Expansion", HELINEWS, (1995), no. 2, pages 1 - 4, XP002909200