EP0683490 - Digital signal reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murabayashi, Noboru, c/o Intellectual Prop. Div. Sony Corporation, 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303283.6 | 17.05.1995 | [1995/47] | Priority number, date | JP19940126753 | 17.05.1994 Original published format: JP 12675394 | [1995/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683490 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683490 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B27/00, G11B15/18, G11B20/18 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B15/1875 (EP,US);
G11B20/1208 (EP,US);
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/47] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Wiedergabe von digitalen Signalen | [1995/47] | English: | Digital signal reproducing apparatus | [1995/47] | French: | Appareil de reproduction de signaux numériques | [1995/47] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2002 | GB | 17.05.2002 | [2003/47] |
Former [2003/17] | GB | 17.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH06244807 ; | [A]EP0155101 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 21 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 4 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US4774605 (KATO TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 21; claim 5 *; | [A]EP0310442 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]US4943872 (YAMAZAKI SHOHEI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 3 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 25 *; | [A]EP0509594 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 52 * * column 7, line 20 - line 55 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941130), vol. 018, no. 629, Database accession no. (E - 1637), & JP06244807 A 19940902 (SONY CORP) [XP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH05198782 |