Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0691791

EP0691791 - Method and apparatus for overlaying digitally generated graphics over an analog video signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
General Instrument Corporation
101 Tournament Drive
Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US
Former [1996/02]For all designated states
GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE
2200 Byberry Road
Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zeidler, David E.
642 Griffiths Road
Warrington, PA 18976 / US
02 / Simons, Robert M.
1009 Springside Way
Lansdale, PA 19446 / US
03 / Zhu, Qiang
76 Maplewood Drive
Maple Shade, NJ 08052 / US
[1996/02]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [1996/02]Musker, David Charles , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date95303331.318.05.1995
[1996/02]
Priority number, dateUS1994027102606.07.1994         Original published format: US 271026
[1996/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0691791
Date:10.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0691791
Date:24.04.1996
[1996/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0691791
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/64, H04N5/445, H04N9/76
[1996/17]
Former International [1996/02]H04N9/64, H04N5/445
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überlagerung von digital generierten graphischen Zeichen über ein analoges Videosignal[1996/02]
English:Method and apparatus for overlaying digitally generated graphics over an analog video signal[1996/02]
French:Méthode et appareil pour superposer des graphiques générés de façon numérique sur un signal vidéo analogique[1996/02]
Examination procedure21.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
03.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.1999Fee for grant paid
03.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2000
GR01.03.2000
IT01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
IE18.05.2000
DK01.06.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/07]AT01.03.2000
GR01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
IE18.05.2000
DK01.06.2000
Former [2003/45]AT01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
IE18.05.2000
DK01.06.2000
Former [2002/23]AT01.03.2000
SE01.03.2000
IE18.05.2000
Former [2001/50]AT01.03.2000
IE18.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT01.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0406698  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 15 * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 26; figure 1 * [A] 1-14;
 [A]EP0558120  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,10,15 * column 7, line 49 - column 9, line 36 *;
 [AD]EP0369471  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,10,15 * abstract *;
 [AD]US4639765  (D HONT LODEWIJK J [NL]) [AD] 1,10,15 * column A; figures 2A,2B *;
 [A]JPH04368078
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930514), vol. 17, no. 241, Database accession no. (E - 1364), [A] 1,10,15 * abstract *
by applicantUS4639765
 US5051817