Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0683249

EP0683249 - Method for the growth of compound semiconductor layer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/47]Method and apparatus for the growth of compound semiconductor layer
[1999/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishizumi, Takashi
2-18, Yoneyama-dai 5-chome
Kanmaki-cho, Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP
02 / Kaneiwa, Shinji
115-5, Ishiki-cho
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Suckling, Andrew Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park
Heatley Road
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Suckling, Andrew Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Former [1998/47]Suckling, Andrew Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Former [1995/47]Suckling, Andrew Michael
Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95303333.918.05.1995
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateJP1994010676020.05.1994         Original published format: JP 10676094
[1995/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0683249
Date:22.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0683249
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:C30B25/02, C30B25/14, C30B25/12
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Züchtung einer Halbleiterverbindungsschicht[1999/15]
English:Method for the growth of compound semiconductor layer[1999/15]
French:Méthode pour la croissance d'une couche d'un composé semi-conducteur[1999/15]
Former [1995/47]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Züchtung einer Halbleiterverbindungsschicht
Former [1995/47]Method and apparatus for the growth of compound semiconductor layer
Former [1995/47]Méthode et appareil pour la croissance d'une couche d'un composé semi-conducteur
Examination procedure06.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/14]
25.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
01.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1999Fee for grant paid
14.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99202642.7  / EP0964083
Opposition(s)30.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR29.03.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/16]FR25.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6090894  ;
 [A]GB1526694  (GOLDIN ET AL);
 [A]EP0175030  (BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC);
 [A]EP0015390  (OY LOHJA AB)
 [X]  - TISCHLER ET AL, "Growth and characterization of compound semiconductors by atomic layer epitaxy", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., AMSTERDAM NL, (198609), vol. 77, no. 1-3, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-0248(86)90287-3, pages 89 - 94, XP024461618 [X] 1-3,5,8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(86)90287-3
 [X]  - BEDAIR ET AL, "Atomic layer epitaxy of III-V binary compounds", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (198507), vol. 47, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1063/1.96401, pages 51 - 53, XP002183797 [X] 1,2,5,8 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.96401
 [X]  - DIP ET AL, "Atomic layer epitaxy of GaAs with a 2um/h growth rate", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19930510), vol. 62, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1063/1.109370, pages 2378 - 2380, XP000367438 [X] 8 * page 2378 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.109370
 [X]  - SUMAKERIS ET AL, "Layer b layer epitaxial growth of GaN at low temperatures", THIN SOLID FILMS, LAUSANNE CH, (19930325), vol. 225, no. 1/2, pages 244 - 249, XP002183799 [X] 1,8
 [X]  - BEDAIR ET AL, "Gallium arsenide and related compounds 1990; Atomic layer epitaxy of GaAs and AlGaAs", INST PHYS. CONF.SER, BRISTOL, PH, USA, (199009), vol. 112, pages 143 - 148 [X] 1,8 * page 246, column 1, line 6 - line 14; figure 1 *
 [X]  - DENBAARS ET AL, "Atomic layer epitaxy of compound semiconductors with metalorganic precursors", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH., AMSTERDAM NL, (19891101), vol. 98, no. 1/2, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-0248(89)90199-1, pages 195 - 208, XP024421765 [X] 1,8 * figure 9 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(89)90199-1
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850919), vol. 9, no. 233, Database accession no. (C - 304)<1956> , & JP60090894 A 19850522 (FUJITSU K.K.) [A] * abstract *