Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684322

EP0684322 - Ceramic coating-forming agent and process for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KAISUI KAGAKU KENKYUJO
16-11, Shimohatake-cho, Yawatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi
Fukuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KAISUI KAGAKU KENKYUJO
16-11, Shimohatake-cho, Yawatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyata, Shigeo
14-14, Nishihon-machi 4-chome, Yawatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken / JP
[1995/48]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date95303441.023.05.1995
[1995/48]
Priority number, dateJP1994013264223.05.1994         Original published format: JP 13264294
[1995/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0684322
Date:29.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0684322
Date:22.05.1996
[1996/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684322
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C04B35/20, C21D8/12
[1996/24]
Former International [1996/19]C23C2/00
Former International [1995/48]C23C4/10, C23C30/00, C23C24/08, C23C26/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/48]
TitleGerman:Keramische Beschichtigung und Verfahren zur Herstellung[1995/48]
English:Ceramic coating-forming agent and process for the production thereof[1995/48]
French:Revêtement céramique et procédé de sa fabrication[1995/48]
Examination procedure12.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
08.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:SearchJPS60197883  [ ] (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 JPS6056058  [ ] (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al);
 [X]WO9301329  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1 *ABSTRACT*;
 [X]JPH03207807  ;
 [X]EP0525467  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0577124  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0416420  (ARMCO INC [US]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0535651  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0589418  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [E]WO9525820  (EBG ELEKTROMAGNET WERKSTOFFE [DE], et al) [E] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [E]EP0699771  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [E] 1 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - KONNO, TOYOHIKO ET AL, "Forsterite insulation coating on oriented silicon steel sheets", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19860407), vol. 104, no. 14, Database accession no. 114015, XP002000844 [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - NIPPON STEEL CORP., JAPAN ET AL, "Hearth rolls with resistance to material sticking and peeling", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850826), vol. 103, no. 8, Database accession no. 58099, XP002000845 [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911204), vol. 015, no. 478, Database accession no. (C - 0891), [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract *
by applicantJPS4732198B
 JPS4829477B