Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0686926

EP0686926 - Method and apparatus for optimal portfolio replication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Refusal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Algorithmics International Corp.
Chancery House, High Street
Bridgetown, Barbados, West Indies / BB
[2000/30]
Former [1997/13]For all designated states
Algorithmics Holdings Inc.
822 Richmond Street West
Toronto, Ontario M6J 1C9 / CA
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
Dembo, Ron S.
822 Richmond St. W.
Toronto, Ontario MCJ 1C9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Dembo, Ron S.
398 Markham Street
Toronto, Ontario M6G 2K9 / CA
[1997/13]
Former [1995/50]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date95303465.923.05.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateUS1994024804224.05.1994         Original published format: US 248042
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0686926
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0686926
Date:12.06.1996
[1996/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Apparat zum optimalen Replizieren von Portfolios[1995/50]
English:Method and apparatus for optimal portfolio replication[1995/50]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la duplication optimale de portefeuilles[1995/50]
Examination procedure05.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/05]
08.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/01]
07.08.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/01]
Request for further processing for:19.07.2002Request for further processing filed
19.07.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.08.2002Decision despatched
09.08.2001Request for further processing filed
09.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.08.2001Decision despatched
26.04.2000Request for further processing filed
26.04.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.05.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
23.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US5148365  (DEMBO RON S [CA]) [X] 1-10 * page 8, column 12 - page 10, column 17 * * column 10, line 18 - column 11, line 58; figures 4A,4B,4C *;
 [A]WO9215953  (SIGNATURE FINANCIAL GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0401203  (MJT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03103966  ;
 [A]JPH03189862  ;
 [A]JPH0377163
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910730), vol. 015, no. 300, Database accession no. (P - 1232), [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911115), vol. 015, no. 451, Database accession no. (P - 1276), [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910624), vol. 015, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 1218), [A] 1,6 * abstract *