EP0685257 - Shoe insole comprising moisture absorbent material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/49] | Moisture absorbent material and articles incorporating such material | ||
[1999/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. FILIPITSCH & CO. KEG Schmelzgasse 12/20 1020 Vienna / AT | [2000/02] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states C. FILIPITSCH & CO. KEG Margaretenstrasse 25 A-1040 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Filipitsch, Claus Würthgasse 10 A-1190 Vienna / AT | 02 /
Fedotov, Albert W. Morskoj prospekt 50, kw. 15 630090 Novosibirsk / RU | 03 /
Talalaytschenko, Oleg I. ul. Dostoevskogo 18, kw. 22 630081 Novosibirsk / RU | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Jennings, Nigel Robin, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95303578.9 | 26.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | RU19940020431 | 02.06.1994 Original published format: RU 94020431 | AT19940001297 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: AT 129794 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685257 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685257 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/04, A43B17/10, B01J20/28 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
A43B17/10 (EP,US);
A43B1/0045 (EP,US);
A43B17/102 (EP,US);
B01J20/046 (EP,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28028 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/28069 (EP,US);
B01J20/28078 (EP,US);
B01J20/28097 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24413 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24471 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24496 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24579 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2462 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249957 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24997 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249974 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249999 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Schuheinlegesohle mit feuchtigkeitsabsorbierendem Material | [1999/04] | English: | Shoe insole comprising moisture absorbent material | [1999/04] | French: | Semelle incorporant un matériau absorbant l'humidité | [1999/04] |
Former [1995/49] | Feuchtigkeitsabsorbierendes Material und damit versehene Artikel | ||
Former [1995/49] | Moisture absorbent material and articles incorporating such material | ||
Former [1995/49] | Matériau absorbant l'humidité et articles incorporant un tel matériau | Examination procedure | 08.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04] | Request for further processing for: | 08.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59203637 ; | [A]JPS60241930 ; | [A]US1740351 (HAJIME ISOBE) [A] 1,3,4 * IN TOTALITY *; | [A]FR845760 (JAUBERT); | [A]FR1282616 (MIOT) [A] 1,6,7,10 * IN TOTALITY *; | [A]DE1937373 (ASS PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1,7,9 * pages 5-6; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0074063 (COLLO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6,9 * pages 1-6; claims 1-4,10,11,19 *; | [A]EP0498965 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1,7,8,10 * columns 6-7; claims 1-15 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 71, Database accession no. (C - 272), & JP59203637 A 19841117 (SHOKUBAI) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 03, Database accession no. 86-018135, & JPS60241930 A 19851130 (NITTETSU MINING) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |