Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0717931

EP0717931 - Low softening point chocolate and process for producing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED
1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 542 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
FUJI OIL COMPANY, LIMITED
1-5, Nishishinsaibashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 542 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kida, Haruyasu
B104, 4-2-3, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi
Kitasoma-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Arai, Masako
306, 5-5-1, Kinunodai, Yawara-mura
Tsukuba-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Tashiro, Yoichi
3-7-5, Matsumaedai, Moriya-machi
Kitasoma-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
04 / Baba, Hideki
2-3-4, Kibogaoka, Kumatori-cho
Sennan-gun, Osaka-fu / JP
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date95303869.206.06.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateJP1994025450323.09.1994         Original published format: JP 25450394
[1996/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0717931
Date:26.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0717931
Date:02.01.1997
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0717931
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:A23G1/00
[1996/26]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Schokolade mit niedrigem Erweichungspunkt und Herstellungsverfahren[1996/26]
English:Low softening point chocolate and process for producing thereof[1996/26]
French:Chocolat à point de ramollissement bas et procédé de fabrication[1996/26]
Examination procedure22.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
04.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1999Fee for grant paid
26.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4594259  (BAKER JOSEPH S [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-8,9 * column 5, line 37 - column 8, line 3 * * column 20, line 51 - column 22, line 40 *;
 [Y]EP0426155  (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5-8 * Table 1, sample 2, 6; table 3, 4 *; page 5, lines 39-53; claims 1,3 * * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 6 *;
 [Y]EP0502697  (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * page 3, lines 3-24 * * page 4, lines 23-30 *;
 [X]EP0547651  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 2, columns 1-35; examples 2,3; claims 1,12,15-17 * * page 3, lines 2-4 *;
 [X]EP0285422  (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * example 2, comparative example 4 *; page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 15 * * page 4, lines 36-50 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 61 *;
 [A]EP0321227  (FUJI OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,10,11 * column 5, lines 19-22 * * column 11, lines 22-26; examples 2,5,7; claim - *;
 [A]WO9324017  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * examples 8-10; claims 1-10,20 *;
 [A]US4199611  (ITO TADASU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * Composition 6, 7 *; column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 8; claim 1; tables 2,3 * * column 6, lines 66-68 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 2 *;
 [A]US4364868  (HARGREAVES NEIL G) [A] 1 * column W *
by applicantJPS53115863
 JPS60221035
 JPS61209545
 JPS5420941
 JPS63240745
 JPS6460330
 JPS6358941
 JPH06227851