Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0687109

EP0687109 - Multimedia data presentation device and editing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kozuka, Masayuki
19-1-1207 Ishizu-Minami-machi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP
02 / Fletcher, Paul
2 Anderson Place
Edinburgh EH6 5NP / GB
03 / McGill, Gary
2 Anderson Place
Edinburgh EH6 5NP / GB
04 / Yamada, Yasutaka
1-27-33-B103, Kitanaburi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
05 / Endo, Koichiro
1-5-7-1505, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 534 / JP
06 / Rogers, Mark
2 Anderson Place
Edinburgh EH6 5NP / GB
07 / Cooke, Phil
2 Anderson Place
Edinburgh EH6 5NP / GB
08 / Inoue, Mitsuhiro
3-12-19, Takejima, Nishi-Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 555 / JP
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Cummings, Sean Patrick , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Cummings, Sean Patrick , et al
David Keltie Associates Audrey House Ely Place
London EC1N 6SN / GB
Application number, filing date95304015.109.06.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateJP1994012907710.06.1994         Original published format: JP 12907794
JP1994013002013.06.1994         Original published format: JP 13002094
JP1994013002413.06.1994         Original published format: JP 13002494
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0687109
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0687109
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/765, G11B27/00
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Vorführ- und Schneideeinrichtung für Daten mehrerer Medien[1995/50]
English:Multimedia data presentation device and editing device[1995/50]
French:Dispositif à présenter et assembler des données de plusieurs milieus[1995/50]
Examination procedure11.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/33]
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2000Fee for grant paid
12.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Request for further processing for:13.03.1999Request for further processing filed
13.03.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.03.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9110321  (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1,11,19,20;
 [A]US4979050  (WESTLAND WILLIAM F [US], et al) [A] 1,11,19,20;
 [A]EP0599607  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11,19,20;
 [A]GB2149996  (CANON KK) [A] 1,11,19,20