blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0704796

EP0704796 - Capability engine method and apparatus for a microkernel data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Magee, James Michael
5310 Canal Drive
Lake Worth, Florida 33463 / US
02 / Sotomayor, Guy Gil, Jr.
6042 Sherwood Glen Way, Apt. 3
West Palm Beach, Florida 33415 / US
03 / Youngworth, Christopher Dean
3 Gulfview Court
Savoy, Illinois 61874 / US
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Williams, Julian David
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Mail Point 110
Hursley Park, Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]Williams, Julian David
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date95304188.616.06.1995
[1996/14]
Priority number, dateUS1994026331328.09.1994         Original published format: US 263313
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0704796
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0704796
Date:01.07.1998
[1998/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704796
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/46
[1996/14]
CPC:
G06F9/468 (EP); G06F15/163 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät mit Fähigkeitsvorrichtung für ein Mikrokern-Datenverarbeitungssystem[1996/14]
English:Capability engine method and apparatus for a microkernel data processing system[1996/14]
French:Méthode et appareil à dispositif de capacité pour un système de traitement de données à micro-noyaux[1996/14]
Examination procedure27.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
22.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.1999Fee for grant paid
30.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
IT19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/35]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US4387427  (COX GEORGE W, et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 9 - column 8, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0447038  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 38; figure 1 *;
 [X]  - FINE T ET AL, "ASSURING DISTRIBUTED TRUSTED MACH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTER SCOIETY SYMPOSIUM ON RESEARCH IN SECURI AND PRIVACY, OAKLAND, MAY 24 - 26, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930524), no. SYMP. 14, pages 206 - 218, XP000416066 [X] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - BRANSTAD, TAJALLI, MAYER, DALVA, "Access mediation in a message passing kernel", 1989 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY, US, (19890501), pages 66 - 72, XP000041223 [X] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECPRI.1989.36278
 [A]  - LI GONG, "A SECURE IDENTITY-BASED CAPABILITY SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY, OAKLAND, MAY 1 - 3, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890501), no. -, pages 56 - 63, XP000041222 [A] 1-12
by applicant   - MIKE ACCETTA, ET AL., "MACH: A new kernel foundation for UNIX development", Proceedings of the Summer 1986 USENIX Conference
    - DAVID GOLUB, ET AL., "UNIX as an application program", Proceedings of the Summer 1990 USENIX Conference
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.