Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0697773

EP0697773 - Audience response system and data transfer protocol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fleetwood Group, Inc.
11832 James Street, Post Office Box 1259 Holland
Michigan 49422-1259 / US
[2008/26]
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
Fleetwood Group, Inc.
11832 James Street, Post Office Box 1259
Holland, Michigan 49422-1259 / US
Former [1996/08]For all designated states
FLEETWOOD FURNITURE COMPANY, INC.
11832 James Street, Post Office Box 1259
Holland, Michigan 49422-1259 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Derks, Harry G.
600 South 96th Avenue
Holland, Michigan 49423 / US
[1996/08]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Former [2007/31]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Former [2004/05]Bockhorni, Josef , et al
Patent-& Rechtsanwälte, Grosse, Bockhorni, Schumacher, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [1996/08]Hale, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date95304487.226.06.1995
[1996/08]
Priority number, dateUS1994026584324.06.1994         Original published format: US 265843
[1996/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0697773
Date:21.02.1996
[1996/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0697773
Date:21.05.1997
[1997/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0697773
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0697773
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04H9/00
[1996/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Sammeln von Zuhörerreaktionen und Datenübertragungsprotokoll[1996/08]
English:Audience response system and data transfer protocol[1996/08]
French:Système pour recueillir des réponses du public et protocole de transfert de données[1996/08]
Examination procedure09.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
28.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
24.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2002Fee for grant paid
22.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.06.2003   
Promethean Limited
TDS House Lower Philips Road
Blackburn, Lancs. BB1 5TH / GB
Opponent's representative
Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2003/32]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2003   
Promethean Limited
TDS House Lower Philips Road
Blackburn, Lancs. BB1 5TH / GB
Opponent's representative
Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
05.08.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.03.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.04.2007Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.11.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.01.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.04.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition21.09.2007Appeal received No.  T1672/07
27.11.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0619663  (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PX] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 13; figure 1; claims 1,5,12 *;
 [A]EP0556853  (ITALTEST SRL [IT]) [A] 1,27-29 * column 1, line 1 - line 52; figure 1; claims 1,3-5,8 *;
 [A]DE4321801  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,27-29 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 9; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]CA2108935  (TE ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1,27-29 * page 7, line 1 - line 19; figures 1,2; claim 1 *
ExaminationUS5093786
 US5379213
 US4238893
 US5002491
 US3445815
 GB1523753
 GB1078926
 US3245157
 US3314172
 US3491464
 US4048729
 US5101406
 US5273437
 US3416243
by applicantUS5093786