Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0694337

EP0694337 - Method for reducing microfoam in a spray-applied waterborne thermoset composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Larson, Gary Robert
2183 Claremont Drive
Hatfield, Pennsylvania 19440 / US
02 / Puschak, Caren Ann
3005 Blackswift Road
Norristown, Pennsylvania 19403 / US
03 / Wood, Kurt Arthur
1871 Keith Road
Abington, Pennsylvania 19001 / US
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB
Former [2003/17]Kent, Venetia Katherine , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB
Former [2000/39]Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Postfach 33 05 23
80065 München / DE
Former [1999/22]Buckley, Guy Julian , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Former [1999/06]Angell, David Whilton , et al
ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Former [1996/05]Smith, Julian Philip Howard , et al
Rohm and Haas (UK) Limited, European Operations Patent Dept., Lennig House, 2 Masons Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date95304516.827.06.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateUS1994026970701.07.1994         Original published format: US 269707
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0694337
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0694337
Date:10.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/06]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0694337
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:B05D1/02, C08F8/30
[1996/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verminderung des Mikro-Schaumes bei wässrigen wärmehärtbaren aufgesprühten Zusammensetzungen[2003/14]
English:Method for reducing microfoam in a spray-applied waterborne thermoset composition[1996/05]
French:Procédé pour réduire la micro-mousse dans une composition aqueuse thermodurcissable appliquée par pulvérisation[1996/05]
Former [1996/05]Verfahren zur Verminderung der Mikro-Schaumes bei wässrigen wärmehärtbaren aufgesprühten Zusammensetzungen
Examination procedure05.07.1995Examination requested  [1996/05]
09.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.1998Fee for grant paid
12.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.11.1999  25.11.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bardehle, Heinz, et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/02]
Opponent(s)01  09.11.1999  25.11.1999  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
20.01.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.07.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.10.2001Date of oral proceedings
05.12.2001Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.12.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.12.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.02.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.04.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition01.02.2002Appeal received No.  T0254/02
15.10.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3526540  (LINDEMANN MARTIN K, et al) [X] 7 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2168357  (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) [X] 7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3386939  (MESEC KENNETH J) [X] 7 * column 5, line 46 - line 49 *;
 [DA]DE1619263  (INTERNAT LATEX & CHEMICAL CORP) [DA] 1 * page 2, line 19 - line 23 *;
 [A]EP0254417  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4749616  (LIU LELAND L [US], et al) [DA] 7;
 [A]EP0379892  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5021469  (LANGERBEINS KLAUS [DE], et al) [DA] 7;
 [A]WO9102775  (UNION OIL CO [US]) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5185396  (BIALE JOHN [US]) [DA] 7
ExaminationEP0657516
 DE3724369
 EP0015644
 EP0593151
 EP0130336
 EP0121083
 CA2090144
 DE3610576
    - Progress in Organic Coatings, 17 (1989) 27-39,
by applicantUS4749616
 US5021469
 US5185396
 DE1619263
 US4325856
 US4654397
 US4814373
OppositionEP0003516
 EP0676430