blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0689946

EP0689946 - Pneumatic tires [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1996/01]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
No. 10-1 Kyobashi 1-Chome Chuo-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsumoto, Hiroyuki
3-4-2-106, Ogowahigashi-Cho
Kodaira City, Tokyo / JP
[1996/01]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/01]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95304554.928.06.1995
[1996/01]
Priority number, dateJP1994014746929.06.1994         Original published format: JP 14746994
[1996/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0689946
Date:03.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0689946
Date:21.02.1996
[1996/08]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication
No.:EP0689946
Date:06.03.1996
[1996/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0689946
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.1996
ClassificationIPC:B60C11/01, B60C11/12, B60C11/03
[1996/01]
CPC:
B60C11/01 (EP,US); B60C11/03 (EP,US); B60C11/0306 (EP,US);
B60C11/12 (EP,US); B60C11/124 (EP,US); B60C2011/0388 (EP,US);
Y10S152/03 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/01]
TitleGerman:Luftreifen[1996/01]
English:Pneumatic tires[1996/01]
French:Bandages pneumatiques[1996/01]
Examination procedure12.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
03.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2000Fee for grant paid
14.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3104693  (ADOLF BOLENBACH) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]GB2093777  (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 10 - line 20; figure -; example .; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]GB2053817  (MICHELIN & CIE) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]FR2418719  (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [X] 1 * figures 2-5; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]GB2190048  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1 * page 3, line 52 - line 58; figure 4; claim 11 *;
 [X]JPS62261507  ;
 [A]JPS62261508
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880428), vol. 012, no. 141, Database accession no. (M - 691), & JP62261507 A 19871113 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880428), vol. 12, no. 141, Database accession no. (M - 691), & JP62261508 A 00000000 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.) [A] 2-5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.