Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0753536

EP0753536 - Thermoplastic resin composition having laser marking ability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/03]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, En Lai, c/o Chiba Research Center
Teijin Limited, 1-4-13, Ohonodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267 / JP
02 / Sugie, Kiyoshi, c/o Chiba Research Center
Teijin Limited, 1-4-13, Ohonodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267 / JP
03 / Suzuki, Mioko, c/o Chiba Research Center
Teijin Limited, 1-4-13, Ohonodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267 / JP
04 / Ogawa, Yoshinari, c/o Chiba Research Center
Teijin Limited, 1-4-13, Ohonodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba 267 / JP
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1997/03]Votier, Sidney David , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95304916.013.07.1995
[1997/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0753536
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0753536
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08K3/00, C08K3/22, C08K3/32, C08K3/34, C08K3/38, C08L101/00, C08L67/02, B41M1/30
[1997/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/03]
TitleGerman:Mit Laser beschriftbare thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung[1997/03]
English:Thermoplastic resin composition having laser marking ability[1997/03]
French:Composition de résine thermoplastique apte à l'inscription par laser[1997/03]
Examination procedure27.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/35]
01.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.1999Fee for grant paid
29.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4235302  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * example 1; claims 1,2 * * page 6, line 37 - line 39 *;
 [X]DE4329395  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH06136273  ;
 [X]EP0190997  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-7,10,11 * examples 2,5-7; claims 1,5,8 * * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 4 *;
 [D]JPS61192737  (CIBA GEIGY AG);
 [X]EP0400305  (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11 * example 13; claims 1,4 *;
 [X]EP0105451  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [X] 1,3-7 * examples 2,4-6; claims 1-3 * * page 4 *;
 [X]US5422383  (TAKAHASHI JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * examples 2-5; claims 1-3,5-8 * * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 26 *;
 [A]DE1933338  (HARRISON MAYER LTD) [A] 1-7 * examples 2,5; claim 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 24, Database accession no. 94-197319, & JPH06136273 A 19940517 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD.) [X] 1-6,8,9 * abstract *
by applicantJPS6111771
 JPH01254743
 JPS6141320
 JPS61192737
 JPH0246314
 JPH04246456
 JPH0259663