Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695510

EP0695510 - Sheet material drying [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TMCI (UK) Limited
448 Basingstoke Road Reading
Berkshire RG2 0LP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
TMCI (UK) Limited
448 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0LP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hall Taylor, Nicholas Simon
Stream Farm, Golford Road
Cranbrook, Kent TN17 3NT / GB
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Silverman, Warren , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]Silverman, Warren , et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date95305121.621.07.1995
[1996/06]
Priority number, dateGB1994001485622.07.1994         Original published format: GB 9414856
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695510
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695510
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:A24B3/14
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:Trocknen von blattförmigen Material[1996/06]
English:Sheet material drying[1996/06]
French:Séchage de matériel en feuilles[1996/06]
Examination procedure30.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/39]
29.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.1999Fee for grant paid
18.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FR05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
IE21.07.2000
LU21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FR05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
IE21.07.2000
LU21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2004/39]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
LU21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2004/07]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2003/45]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2003/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2002/42]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
Former [2002/26]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
Former [2002/23]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
Former [2002/11]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
Former [2001/50]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
IE21.07.2000
Former [2001/09]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2058314  (AMF INC) [X] 5,6,8,9,11-13,15,16 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 7; figure 6 * [A] 1-4;
 [XA]DE1757666  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [X] 5,7-9,12,13 * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 19; figure 5 * * page 2, lines 20-23 * [A] 1-5,14-16;
 [A]US3295222  (CHARLES GEITZ ROBERT);
 [A]US5203354  (HICKLE JOHN N [US]);
 [A]NL6817434  (AMERICAN MACHINE & FOUNDERY CO.);
 [A]DE1657227  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG);
 [A]US4631837  (MAGOON RICHARD E [US])