Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0694859

EP0694859 - Emergency information offering system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kurisu, Hiromitsu
Hitachi Kamitsuruma Shataku A 109
17 12, Yutakacho, Sagamihara shi / JP
02 / Komura, Fuminobu
Okurayama Haimu 6 503, 834 2, Mamedocho
Kohoku ku, Yokohama shi / JP
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date95305238.827.07.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateJP1994017797929.07.1994         Original published format: JP 17797994
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0694859
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0694859
Date:24.06.1998
[1998/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0694859
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, G08B25/00
[1998/26]
Former International [1996/05]G06F17/60
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Notfall-Informationssystem[1996/05]
English:Emergency information offering system[1996/05]
French:Système d'information pour urgences[1996/05]
Examination procedure16.08.1995Examination requested  [1996/05]
08.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2001Fee for grant paid
16.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3843043  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1-19 * column 6, line 17 - line 57; claims 1,2,4 *;
 [DA]US5185697  (JACOBS KENDALL E [US], et al) [DA] 1,10,19 * abstract * * column 6, line 30 - line 42 *;
 [A]US3848193  (MARTIN R, et al) [A] 5-9,14-18 * abstract *;
 [DA]JPH05183636
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931104), vol. 017, no. 601, Database accession no. (E - 1456), & JP05183636 A 19930723 (TOSHIBA) [DA] 1-19 * abstract *
by applicantDE3043043
 JPH05183636