blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0695600

EP0695600 - Laser-processing head for laser processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Van Liew Avenue Milltown
New Jersey 08850 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
McNEIL-PPC, INC.
Van Liew Avenue
Milltown New Jersey 08850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / James, William A.
290 Broadway
Long Branch, NJ 07740 / US
02 / Breitkopf, Stephen H.
447 Barrymore Place
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
03 / Kirchhoff, Robert H.
115 State Street
Amherst, MA 01003 / US
04 / Provell, Robert G.
49 Chestnut Street
Spotswood, NJ 08884 / US
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95305373.301.08.1995
[1996/06]
Priority number, dateUS1994028433902.08.1994         Original published format: US 284339
[1996/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0695600
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0695600
Date:24.07.1996
[1996/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695600
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.1996
ClassificationIPC:B23K26/14
[1996/06]
CPC:
B23K26/1482 (EP,US); B23K26/064 (EP,US); B23K26/0648 (EP,US);
B23K26/0665 (EP,US); B23K26/14 (EP,US); B23K26/142 (EP,US);
B23K26/1438 (EP,US); B23K26/1476 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:Ein Laserbehandlungskopf für eine Laserbehandlungsvorrichtung[1996/06]
English:Laser-processing head for laser processing apparatus[1996/06]
French:Tête de traitement laser pour appareil de traitement au laser[1999/13]
Former [1996/06]Tête de traitement du laser pour appareil de traitement au laser
Examination procedure09.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/11]
25.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1999Fee for grant paid
04.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3696230  (FRIEDRICH HOWARD R);
 [XA]US4031351  (MARTIN JEAN);
 [X]DE3918363  (INST NAT SCIENCES APPLIQ [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.