Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0696434

EP0696434 - Collection assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Former [1996/07]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Burns, James A.
1104 Kipling Road
Elizabeth, New Jersey / US
[1996/07]
Representative(s)Ruffles, Graham Keith
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/07]Ruffles, Graham Keith
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date95305382.401.08.1995
[1996/07]
Priority number, dateUS1994028972112.08.1994         Original published format: US 289721
[1996/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0696434
Date:14.02.1996
[1996/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0696434
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/15
[2002/47]
Former International [1996/07]A61B5/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/07]
TitleGerman:Abnahmeröhrchen[1996/07]
English:Collection assembly[1996/07]
French:Récipient pour prélèvement[1996/07]
Examination procedure13.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
22.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2002Fee for grant paid
25.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9323165  (LEOPARDI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * * page 13, line 8 - line 20; tables 1-3 * [A] 2,3,5,7;
 [YA]EP0517119  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1,9 * column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 3; tables 1-8 * [A] 8;
 [D]US5288466  (BURNS JAMES A [US]);
 [A]WO9000442  (SARSTEDT WALTER GERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,9 * page 5, line 18 - page 10, line 5; tables 1-5 *
by applicantUS5288466