Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0705903 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0705903



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 6711
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
22.05.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
17.07.2009 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 2
14.07.2009 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
25.06.2009 French translation of claims Opposition 2
25.06.2009 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
25.06.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.2009 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
16.03.2009 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
16.03.2009 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
16.03.2009 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
16.03.2009 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
16.03.2009 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
16.03.2009 Text intended for grant Opposition 158
09.03.2009 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
04.03.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.03.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.02.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.02.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 55
28.11.2008 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 32
05.11.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.11.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 8
04.11.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.11.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.11.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.10.2008 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 5
20.10.2008 F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet Appeal 1
20.10.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.10.2008 Sequence listing Appeal 1
17.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
17.10.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.10.2008 Claims Appeal 3
10.10.2008 Claims Appeal 2
10.10.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.10.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.10.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
02.10.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.10.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 2
22.09.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
15.09.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
11.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 2
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 2
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 3
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 2
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 3
02.06.2008 Claims Appeal 1
02.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
26.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.05.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
21.05.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 1
20.05.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.01.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.01.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.01.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.01.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 17
18.01.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.01.2008 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
14.03.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
07.03.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
06.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 5
06.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
02.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
01.03.2006 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
01.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 30
01.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 33
01.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 30
01.03.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 33
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 1
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 10
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 8
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 10
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 11
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 3
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
01.03.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.02.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 33
28.02.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 30
27.10.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 5
27.10.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Search / examination 5
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 5
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 1
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 1
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 2
19.10.2005 Claims Appeal 3
19.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
19.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 10
19.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 77
19.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 77
19.10.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
17.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
17.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 5
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 3
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 24
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 7
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 6
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 4
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.10.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.10.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
04.10.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.10.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
25.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
25.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Search / examination 4
22.08.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 2
22.08.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 4
22.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
22.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
10.08.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.08.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 5
01.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.07.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
23.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
20.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 2
20.06.2005 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.06.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.06.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 4
18.06.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
09.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 10
09.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
09.06.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
09.06.2005 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 21
09.06.2005 Text intended for grant Opposition 154
08.06.2005 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
16.03.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.03.2005 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 5
17.02.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 4
17.02.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
25.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 23
25.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
25.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
25.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
25.01.2005 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
25.01.2005 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 13
25.01.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
19.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.01.2005 Annex Opposition 1
17.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
17.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
13.01.2005 Submission concerning representation Opposition 5
07.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.01.2005 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
30.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 25
29.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
24.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 91
24.11.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 25
24.11.2004 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 25
24.11.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.11.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
12.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
09.11.2004 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
05.11.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.10.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
20.10.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
18.10.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
18.10.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
15.10.2004 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
13.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.04.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.04.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 16
20.04.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.03.2003 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
03.03.2003 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
26.02.2003 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 9
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.02.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.02.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 141
12.12.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
12.12.2002 Claims Opposition 5
12.12.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
12.12.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.09.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.09.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.06.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.03.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.03.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.03.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 1
01.03.2002 Authorisation Opposition 5
01.03.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
01.03.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
25.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
25.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
25.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
22.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 500
22.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 76
22.02.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 501
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 164
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 21
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 25
22.02.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
24.08.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.08.2001 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
12.04.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.03.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
22.03.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
16.03.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
13.03.2001 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.03.2001 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Description Search / examination 2
14.02.2001 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 228
25.05.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
10.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 9
10.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 8
10.12.1999 Description Search / examination 4
10.12.1999 Description Search / examination 6
10.12.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.08.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 9
12.05.1999 Description Search / examination 7
12.05.1999 Description Search / examination 7
12.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.03.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.12.1998 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.11.1998 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 139
16.08.1996 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
02.02.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.02.1996 European search report Search / examination 5
04.01.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 152
09.12.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
09.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 147
05.12.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 205
05.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 194
05.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 203
05.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 147
05.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 138
28.11.1995 Drawings Search / examination 18
28.11.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.10.1995 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
12.10.1995 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
11.10.1995 Sequence listing Search / examination 1
25.09.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 7
11.08.1995 Description Search / examination 114
11.08.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Drawings Search / examination 19
11.08.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
11.08.1995 Sequence listing Search / examination 65