blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0742646

EP0742646 - Data compression method and apparatus with expansion protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1996/46]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clark, Airell R.
3940 NW Scenic Drive
Albany, OR 97321 / US
02 / Jung, Brian R.
1149 NW Alder Creek Drive
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
03 / Heineck, Matthew P.
2330 NW Kinderman Drive
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
[1996/46]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/30]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1996/46]Colgan, Stephen James, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95305641.314.08.1995
[1996/46]
Priority number, dateUS1995043726308.05.1995         Original published format: US 437263
[1996/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0742646
Date:13.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0742646
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.1995
ClassificationIPC:H03M7/30, H03M7/48
[1996/46]
CPC:
G06T9/005 (EP,US); H03M7/3088 (EP,US); H03M7/48 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/46]
TitleGerman:Datenkompressionsverfahren und Vorrichtung mit Expansionsschutz[1996/46]
English:Data compression method and apparatus with expansion protection[1996/46]
French:Méthode de compression de données et dispositif avec protection contre l'expansion[1996/46]
Examination procedure14.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/11]
30.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2003Fee for grant paid
13.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0372970  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * column W *;
 [A]US4509038  (HIRANO AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * column 12, line 13 - line 23 *;
 [A]EP0313190  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] * column W *
by applicantUS19940192878
 EP19950300346
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.