Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0698926

EP0698926 - Normally off-static induction thyristor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/09]Normally off-static induction thyristor and method of manufacturing the same
[1999/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.10.2001 [2001/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/09]For all designated states
NGK INSULATORS, LTD.
2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Terasawa, Yoshio
622-19, Ichige, Hitachinaka -city
Ibaraki-pref., 312 / JP
[1996/09]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/09]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date95305727.016.08.1995
[1996/09]
Priority number, dateJP1994020254626.08.1994         Original published format: JP 20254694
[1996/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0698926
Date:28.02.1996
[1996/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0698926
Date:15.04.1998
[1998/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0698926
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/739, H01L21/332
[1996/09]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   SE [1996/09]
TitleGerman:Im Normalzustand abgeschalteter statischer Induktionsthyristor[1999/35]
English:Normally off-static induction thyristor[1999/35]
French:Thyristor à induction statique normalement non-conducteur[1999/35]
Former [1996/09]Im Normalzustand abgeschalteter statischer Induktionsthyristor und Herstellungsverfahren
Former [1996/09]Normally off-static induction thyristor and method of manufacturing the same
Former [1996/09]Thyristor à induction statique normalement non-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure27.08.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
23.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2000Fee for grant paid
31.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99124986.3  / EP0994514
Opposition(s)26.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US4198645  (NISHIZAWA JUN-ICHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 2 - line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6262558  ;
 [A]EP0190508  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 4C,4D *;
 [A]EP0022483  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 9-14 * page 5 - page 6; figure 2 *;
 [PX]EP0663698  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,7,8 * figure 26 *;
 [E]EP0687015  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 9-14 * figures 3,4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870813), vol. 011, no. 249, Database accession no. (E - 532), [A] 1-8 * the whole document *