Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0699822

EP0699822 - A well data telemetry system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weatherford/Lamb, Inc.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston
Texas 77027 / US
For all designated states
Target Well Control Limited
Badentoy Road, Badentoy Park, Portlethen
Aberdeen AB12 4YA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/29]For all designated states
WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.
515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600
Houston Texas 77027 / US
For all designated states
Target Well Control Limited
Badentoy Road, Badentoy Park, Portlethen
Aberdeen AB12 4YA / GB
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Dailey IDS Limited
Badentoy Road, Badentoy Park
Portlethen, Aberdeen AB1 4YA / GB
Former [1996/10]For all designated states
Integrated Drilling Services Limited
Badentoy Road, Badentoy Park
Portlethen, Aberdeen AB1 4YA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / McClure, Paul Anthony
12 Belvidere Road
Cults, Aberdeen AB1 9MP / GB
[1996/10]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Harding, Richard Patrick , et al
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Former [1996/10]Carter, Gerald
Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
Application number, filing date95306160.304.09.1995
[1996/10]
Priority number, dateGB1994001771903.09.1994         Original published format: GB 9417719
[1996/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0699822
Date:06.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0699822
Date:29.01.1997
[1997/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0699822
Date:30.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1996
ClassificationInternational:E21B47/12, H04B5/00
[1997/04]
Former International [1996/10]E21B47/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IE,   IT,   NL [1996/10]
TitleGerman:Übertragungssystem für Bohrlochdaten[1996/10]
English:A well data telemetry system[1996/10]
French:Système de transmission de données de forage[1996/10]
Examination procedure01.04.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
16.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2003Fee for grant paid
17.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.199703   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2003
IT30.07.2003
IE04.09.2003
DK30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2004/46]AT30.07.2003
IE04.09.2003
DK30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
Former [2004/40]AT30.07.2003
IE04.09.2003
DK30.10.2003
Former [2004/29]AT30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
Former [2004/14]AT30.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4992787  (HELM WALTER A) [X] 1,4,6,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 47 - line 60 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 7 * [Y] 7-9;
 [X]US4057781  (SCHERBATSKOY SERGE A) [X] 1,5,10 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 6; figure - * * column 3, line 47 - line 54 * * column 4, line 13 - line 16 * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 30 *;
 [Y]US3967201  (RORDEN LOUIS H) [Y] 7-9 * column 3, line 41 - line 57 * * column 4, line 34 - line 65 *;
 [A]WO8704028  (MISSON PIERRE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 12 - line 19 * * page 2, line 1534; figure - *;
 [A]US4800385  (YAMAZAKI NOBUYOSHI) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *