blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0702313

EP0702313 - A combined totalizator and fixed odds betting system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAB Limited
495 Harris Street Ultimo
New South Wales 2007 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
TAB Limited
495 Harris Street
Ultimo, New South Wales 2007 / AU
Former [1996/12]For all designated states
TOTALIZATOR AGENCY BOARD
495 Harris Street
Ultimo, New South Wales 2007 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Orford, John Flindt
1/20 Illawarra Street
Allawah, New South Wales 2218 / AU
02 / Wilkinson, Bernard Allen
17 Raleigh Street
Coogee, New South Wales 2034 / AU
[1996/12]
Representative(s)Prentice, Raymond Roy, et al
Calvert's Buildings
52B Borough High Street
London SE1 1XN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Prentice, Raymond Roy, et al
Calvert's Buildings, 52B Borough High Street
London SE1 1XN / GB
Former [1996/12]Prentice, Raymond Roy
R.R. Prentice & Co. The Hop Exchange 24 Southwark Street
London SE1 1TY / GB
Application number, filing date95306332.811.09.1995
[1996/12]
Priority number, dateAU1994PM0811013.09.1994         Original published format: AU PM811094
[1996/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0702313
Date:20.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0702313
Date:03.04.1996
[1996/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702313
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.1996
ClassificationIPC:G06F19/00, G06F17/60
[1996/14]
CPC:
G06Q50/34 (EP,US); G07F17/32 (EP,US); G07F17/3288 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1996/12]G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/12]
Extension statesLT07.10.1995
LV07.10.1995
SI07.10.1995
TitleGerman:Ein kombiniertes Totalisatorwettsystem und Wettsystem mit festen Gewinnchancen und Verfahren dafür[1999/33]
English:A combined totalizator and fixed odds betting system and method[1996/12]
French:Système et méthode combinant les paris de type totalisateur et les paris à probabilité fixée[1999/33]
Former [1996/12]Ein kombinierter Totalisator und Wettsystem mit festen Gewinnchancen und Verfahren dafür
Former [1996/12]Système et méthode combinée de totalisateur et de pari à probabilité fixé
Examination procedure07.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/45]
26.03.1997Observations by third parties
30.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1998Observations by third parties
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2000Fee for grant paid
24.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
IT19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
LU11.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2007/29]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
LU11.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2006/14]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
FR19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
GR19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
DK19.07.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
NL19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/42]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
ES19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/13]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
DE20.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
CH19.04.2000
LI19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/50]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
IE11.09.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
SE19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
PT19.07.2000
FR15.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT19.04.2000
BE19.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2180675  (ATL PTY LTD) [A] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [DA]AU590777B  (ATL PTY LTD)
by applicantAU590777B
otherWO9522883
 EP0749605
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.