Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0704548

EP0704548 - Method for cleaning substrate and depositing protective coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ackerman, John Frederick
5412 Frederick
Cheyenne, Wyoming 82001 / US
02 / Stowell, William Randolph
3379 Salem Ridge Road
Rising Sun, Indiana 47040 / US
03 / Coffinberry, George Albert
8238 Lake Ridge Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
04 / Wood, John Herbert
170 Smolik Road
Saint Johnsville, New York 13452 / US
05 / Beltran, Adrian Maurice
1162 Peaceable Street
Ballston Spa, New York 12020 / US
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/30]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Former [1996/14]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date95306567.918.09.1995
[1996/14]
Priority number, dateUS1994031580730.09.1994         Original published format: US 315807
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0704548
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704548
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C23C16/20, C23C16/02
[1996/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Reinigen von Substraten und Herstellen von Schutzschichten[1996/14]
English:Method for cleaning substrate and depositing protective coating[1996/14]
French:Procédé de nettoyage d'un substrat et de dépôt d'une couche protectrice[1996/14]
Examination procedure04.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/49]
03.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1999Fee for grant paid
16.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2847320  (BULLOFF JACK J) [X] 1,3-5,7-10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH02290974  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910215), vol. 015, no. 064, Database accession no. (C - 0806), [A] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - J.C. MERRIAM, "ALUMINUM 'PLATING' VIA ALKYL GAS", IRON AGE, US, (19651223), vol. 196, no. 26, pages 5 - 53, XP001306461 [A] 2,6 * the whole document *