Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0703065

EP0703065 - Apparatus and method for manufacturing a resin structure reinforced with long fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD.
3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD.
3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome
Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Amaike, Takeshi
67-19, Morishita
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka / JP
02 / Shirai, Yoshimitsu
46-2, Furusho
Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Jackson, Peter
Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/13]Jackson, Peter
HYDE, HEIDE & O'DONNELL 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Application number, filing date95306586.919.09.1995
[1996/13]
Priority number, dateJP1994025276222.09.1994         Original published format: JP 25276294
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0703065
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0703065
Date:10.07.1996
[1996/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0703065
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/54
[1996/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines langfaserverstärkten Harzgegenstandes[1996/13]
English:Apparatus and method for manufacturing a resin structure reinforced with long fibres[1996/13]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication d'un objet en résine renforcée de fibres longues[1996/13]
Examination procedure23.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/10]
16.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4892600  (BEEVER WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 27 - line 63; figure - *;
 [A]US3053717  (BRIGHT ELVIN M) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 63 - line 71; figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0216122  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 13 - line 25; figure 1 *
by applicantUS3993726
 JPS57181852