blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0703196


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
11.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
28.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.09.1999 Renewal fee
16.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.04.1999 Examination report or reply
13.01.1999 Examination report or reply
22.09.1998 Examination report or reply
04.09.1998 Renewal fee
17.07.1998 First examination report
10.07.1998 Examination report or reply
02.09.1997 Renewal fee
24.05.1996 Change - applicant published on  10.07.1996 [1996/28]
10.05.1996 Request for examination filed published on  26.06.1996 [1996/26]
09.02.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.03.1996 [1996/13]