blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0703196
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH08170216Global Dossier 02.07.1996A
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0703196Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0703196 27.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2158700 21.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514742D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514742T 31.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5514199 07.05.1996A
Priority number Date
US30923594 20.09.1994