Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0703196

EP0703196 - Spinner for producing dual-component fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS CORNING
Fiberglas Tower 26
Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US
[1996/28]
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORPORATION
Fiberglas Tower 26
Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Houpt, Ronald A.
148 Jefferson Road
Newark, Ohio 43055 / US
[1996/13]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/13]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date95306601.619.09.1995
[1996/13]
Priority number, dateUS1994030923520.09.1994         Original published format: US 309235
[1996/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0703196
Date:27.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0703196
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/04, C03B37/075, D01D5/18, D01D5/22
[1996/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/13]
TitleGerman:Spinnen zum Herstellen von Zwei-Komponentefasern[1996/13]
English:Spinner for producing dual-component fibers[1996/13]
French:Assiette de fibrage pour la fabrication de fibres à deux compositions[1996/13]
Examination procedure26.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/26]
15.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1999Fee for grant paid
20.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2998620  (STALEGO CHARLES J) [A] 1-8 * column W *;
 [PA]WO9512551  (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [PA] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2998620
 US5277955