Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0706065

EP0706065 - Improved gamma camera system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1996/15]For all designated states
ADAC LABORATORIES
540 Alder Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Geagan, Michael
206 Bloomingdale Avenue
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19807 / US
02 / Goldberg, Edward M.
983-C La Mesa Terrace
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
03 / Wellnitz, Donald R.
1702 Nursery Way
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
04 / Muehllehner, Gerd
404 Oak Lane
Wayne, Pennsylvania 19087 / US
05 / Murphy, Matthew J.
805 Terrace Drive
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
06 / Bertelsen, Hugo
2910 Liberty Drive
Pleasanton, California / US
07 / Nellemann, Peter
2253 Via Espada
Pleasanton, California 94566 / US
08 / Hines, Horace H.
962 Fox Swallow Court
San Jose, California 95120 / US
[1996/15]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis , et al
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/15]Wombwell, Francis , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date95306738.625.09.1995
[1996/15]
Priority number, dateUS1994031793104.10.1994         Original published format: US 317931
US1994031792304.10.1994         Original published format: US 317923
US1994031755303.10.1994         Original published format: US 317553
US1994031778704.10.1994         Original published format: US 317787
US1994031804803.10.1994         Original published format: US 318048
[1996/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0706065
Date:10.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0706065
Date:17.09.1997
[1997/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0706065
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/17, G01T1/208
[1996/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/30]
Former [1996/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbessertes Gammakamera-System[1996/15]
English:Improved gamma camera system[1996/15]
French:Système amélioré avec gamma caméra[1996/15]
Examination procedure25.10.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.10.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.02.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE
22.02.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) PT
25.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/52]
03.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2002Fee for grant paid
21.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00127204.6  / EP1103825
EP00127205.3  / EP1104889
EP00127259.0  / EP1104890
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.12.1995AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995LI   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1995SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR27.11.2002
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4860205  (JATTEAU) [X] 1-3,7,15,16,18,20,21,23,25,26 [A] 33-39,45-63,72-92;
 [A]US5309357  (STARK ET AL.) [A] 1-29,32-75,102-142;
 [A]US5237173  (STARK ET AL.) [A] 143-176;
 [A]US5004904  (YAMAKAWA ET AL.) [A] 58-63,113-176;
 [A]US4413183  (METAL ET AL.) [A] 15-26,32-39,45-84,105-124,129-135;
 [A]US4256960  (SNIDER) [A] 125-176;
 [A]US4486663  (ARSENEAU) [A] 32-39,45-63;
 [A]US4517460  (MEULENBRUGGE ET AL.) [A] 102-176;
 [A]US4580055  (BARFOD) [A] 30,31,64-100,113-115;
 [A]US4583187  (STOUB) [A] 85-176