Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0704373

EP0704373 - Deployment hinge apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL, INC.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL INC.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
SPACE SYSTEMS / LORAL INC.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303-4697 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Baghdasarian, Varouj G.
22757 Stevens Creek Boulevard
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Lewin, John Harvey , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Lewin, John Harvey , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [1996/14]Vaufrouard, John Charles
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date95306759.226.09.1995
[1996/14]
Priority number, dateUS1994031406828.09.1994         Original published format: US 314068
[1996/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0704373
Date:03.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0704373
Date:31.07.1996
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704373
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/22, H01Q1/28, E05D11/10
[1996/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/14]
TitleGerman:Entfaltungsgelenkvorrichtung[1996/14]
English:Deployment hinge apparatus[1996/14]
French:Appareil à charniere de déploiement[1996/14]
MiscellaneousEPB 2000/03: (deleted)
EPB 2000/03: (deleted)
EPB 2000/03: (deleted)
EPB 1997/17: Teilanmeldung 97200219.0 eingereicht am 28/01/97
EPB 1997/17: Divisional application 97200219.0 filed on 28/01/97
EPB 1997/17: Demande divisionnaire 97200219.0 déposée le 28/01/97
Examination procedure25.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
04.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.1999Fee for grant paid
22.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97200219.0  / EP0776826
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4337968  (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 64; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]US4880188  (ROTH MARTIN [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 50; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4578919  (AMADON JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 37 - column 7, line 40; figures 3-9 *;
 [A]DE3215434  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 24; figures 3-8 *
by applicantUS5037043
 US4880188
 US4290168
 US4780726
 US3587999