EP0708378 - Two-component type developer, developing method and image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baba, Yoshinobu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tokunaga, Yuzo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95306880.6 | 29.09.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | JP19940264428 | 05.10.1994 Original published format: JP 26442894 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0708378 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0708378 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708378 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/107, G03G9/10, G03G9/113, G03G9/08 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
G03G9/0819 (EP);
G03G9/10884 (EP,KR,US);
G03G13/09 (EP);
G03G9/1075 (EP,KR,US);
G03G9/108 (EP,KR,US);
G03G9/1085 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/17] | Title | German: | Entwickler des Zweikomponententyps, Entwicklungsverfahren und Bildherstellungsverfahren | [1996/17] | English: | Two-component type developer, developing method and image forming method | [1996/17] | French: | Révélateur du type à deux composants, procédé de développement et procédé de formation d'image | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1124868 ; | [A]JPH04124677 ; | [A]JPS57128347 ; | [A]JPH01297657 ; | [A]EP0317667 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1,13,27 * page 5, line 50 - page 6, line 7; claims 1-3,12-14 *; | [A]EP0384697 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,13,27 * page 4, line 36 - line 37; claims 1-10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890816), vol. 13, no. 368, Database accession no. (P - 919), & JP1124868 A 19890517 (MINOLTA) [A] 1,13,27 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 24, Database accession no. 92-196283, & JPH04124677 A 19920424 (FUJI XEROX) [A] 1,13,27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821110), vol. 6, no. 225, Database accession no. (P - 154)<1103>, & JP57128347 A 19820908 (RICOH) [A] 1,13,27 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900219), vol. 14, no. 88, Database accession no. (P - 1008)<4031>, & JP1297657 A 19891130 (MATSUSHITA) [A] 1,13,27 * abstract * | by applicant | US2297691 | US3666363 | US4071361 | JPS59104663 | JPH058424B |