Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707386

EP0707386 - Multi-user communication system employing spread signatures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1996/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Wornell, Gregory W.
75 Ivy Road
Wellesley, Massachusetts 02181 / US
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date95307014.103.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994032129711.10.1994         Original published format: US 321297
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707386
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707386
Date:07.06.2000
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Mehrbenutzernachrichtenübertragungssystem unter Verwendung von Spreizunterschriften[1996/16]
English:Multi-user communication system employing spread signatures[1996/16]
French:Système de communication à utilisateurs multiplexes utilisant des signatures étalées[1996/16]
Examination procedure24.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
21.05.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5170412  (MASSEY JAMES L [CH]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 4, line 3 - column 9, line 29; figure - *;
 [A]US5031173  (SHORT ROBERT T [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 2, line 16 - column 5, line 44; figure - *;
 [A]US5170410  (GRESSIER ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 65; figure - *
 [A]  A. WITTNEBEN, "A Novel Bandwidth Efficient Analog Coding/decoding Scheme for Data Transmissiona Over Fading Channels", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NY, US, (19940501), pages 34 - 38, XP000438879 [A] 1-4,7,8 * page 34, line 1 - page 36, line 17; figures 1-3 *