Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0708572 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0708572



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 300
17.07.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 2
05.12.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
07.10.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.05.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.12.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
06.09.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
11.08.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
10.07.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.07.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.06.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
22.06.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
17.05.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.05.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
04.05.2006 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
02.05.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.02.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.02.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
18.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
18.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
18.01.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
17.01.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2006 Claims Appeal 2
12.01.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
21.11.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.11.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
24.09.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.09.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
14.09.2005 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
14.09.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
14.09.2005 Means of redress Search / examination 1
08.09.2005 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
25.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
21.06.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.05.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.04.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
25.04.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.04.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Description Search / examination 1
08.03.2004 Description Search / examination 3
08.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
12.01.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.09.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.09.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 European search report Search / examination 2
24.05.1996 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 1
29.04.1996 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.10.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.10.1995 Claims Search / examination 1
03.10.1995 Description Search / examination 47
03.10.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
03.10.1995 Drawings Search / examination 15
03.10.1995 Priority document Search / examination 79
03.10.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6