Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707066

EP0707066 - Method for producing the SspI restriction endonuclease and methylase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC.
32, Tozer Road Beverly
Massachusetts 01915 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
NEW ENGLAND BIOLABS, INC.
32, Tozer Road
Beverly Massachusetts 01915 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Benner, Jack S.
24 Orchard Road
Hamilton, Massachusetts 01936 / US
02 / Coe, Linda Hornstra
11 Whippoorwill Drive
Newton, New Hampshire 03858 / US
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Davies, Jonathan Mark
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Davies, Jonathan Mark
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date95307106.506.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994031962106.10.1994         Original published format: US 319621
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707066
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707066
Date:10.09.1997
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707066
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/55, C12N15/54, C12N9/22, C12N9/10, C12Q1/68
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung der SspI Restriktionsendonuklease und der entsprechenden Methylase[1999/09]
English:Method for producing the SspI restriction endonuclease and methylase[1996/16]
French:Méthode de production de l'endonucléase de restriction SspI et de la méthylase lui correspondant[1999/09]
Former [1996/16]Verfahren zur Herstellung der SspI Restriktions-Endonuklease und Methylase
Former [1996/16]Méthode de production de l'endonucléase de restriction et de la méthylase SspI
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/16: Due to a PatentIn error this document contains an asterisk at the end of sequences 12 and 14. The asterisks are to be ignored and the length of these sequences to be adapted, i.e. 1 residue less.
Examination procedure23.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/17]
10.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1999Fee for grant paid
13.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]  W. WARREN AND M. MERION, "Rapid HPLC Purification of a Restriction Enzyme from Sphaerotilus sp.", BIOCHROMATOGRAPHY, (1988), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 225 - 30, XP000655221 [A] 1