Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733647

EP0733647 - Polysaccharides and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMINO UP CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
High Tech Hill Shin-Ei, 363-32 Shin-Ei, Toyohira-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
AMINO UP CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
High Tech Hill Shin-Ei, 363-32 Shin-Ei, Toyohira-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 004 / JP
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
AMINO UP CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
High Tech Hill Shin-Ei, 363-32 Shin-Ei, Toyohira-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 004 / JP
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
AMINO UP CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
2-9 Nishioka 3-jo 12-chome, Toyohira-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kosuna, Kenichi
7-22, Nishioka 5-jo, 12-chome, Toyohira-ku
Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date95307113.106.10.1995
[1996/39]
Priority number, dateJP1995009004224.03.1995         Original published format: JP 9004295
[1996/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0733647
Date:25.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0733647
Date:02.05.1997
[1997/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733647
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/00, C12P19/04, // (C12P19/04, C12R1:645)
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/39]
TitleGerman:Polysaccharide und deren Herstellung[1996/39]
English:Polysaccharides and preparation thereof[1996/39]
French:Polysaccharides et leur préparation[1996/39]
Examination procedure20.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/42]
02.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.1999Fee for grant paid
14.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4614733  (YOSHIKUMI CHIKAO [JP], et al)