Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707050

EP0707050 - Pigment containing low-order titanium oxide and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-10 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shio, Shoichiro
c/o Shiseido Res. Center(1), 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Fukuji
c/o Shiseido Res. Center(1), 1050 Nippa-cho
Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Perry, Robert Edward
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Perry, Robert Edward
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date95307150.310.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateJP1994027167911.10.1994         Original published format: JP 27167994
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707050
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707050
Date:12.06.1996
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707050
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/00
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Pigment, welches ein Titansuboxid enthält und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1996/16]
English:Pigment containing low-order titanium oxide and method of manufacturing the same[1996/16]
French:Pigment contenant un sous-oxyde de titane et procédé pour le fabriquer[1996/16]
Examination procedure22.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
21.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1999Fee for grant paid
14.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
LI12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2002/26]CH12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
LI12.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH12.01.2000
LI12.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH17.04.2000
LI17.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH01158077  ;
 [X]JPS61106414  ;
 [PA]JPH0789721  ;
 [XA]JPS60245671  ;
 [X]JPS60245671  ;
 [X]WO9319131  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0338428  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 7 - paragraph 10; claim 3 *;
 [A]JPH0543417  ;
 [A]EP0601761  (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 18,23-25 * claims 5-8 *;
 [A]EP0481460  (ISHIHARA MINING & CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,9 * claims 1,6-8 *;
 [A]JPS58164653  ;
 [A]EP0332071  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 9 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 31, Database accession no. 89-223232, XP002000707 & JPH01158077 A 19890621 (SHISEIDO) [X] 1,5-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860930), vol. 10, no. 287, Database accession no. (C - 375), & JP61106414 A 19860524 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) [X] 1,9 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 950, no. 4, & JP07089721 A 19950404 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) [PA] 1,9,24,25 * abstract *
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 04, Database accession no. 86-024350, XP002000708 & JPS60245671 A 19851205 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 17
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860506), vol. 10, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 343), & JP60245671 A 00000000 (...) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930629), vol. 17, no. 342, Database accession no. (C - 1076), & JP05043417 A 19930223 (SHISEIDO) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 45, Database accession no. 83-810901, XP002000868 & JPS58164653 A 19830929 (MITSUBISHI METAL) [A] 1,8 * abstract *