EP0707221 - Ultrasonic diagnostic system gain control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC. 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell Washington 98041 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY LABORATORIES, INC. 22100 Bothell Everett Highway Bothell, Washington 98041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rust, David 3002 NW 72nd Street Seattle, Washington 98117 / US | 02 /
Roundhill, David N. 16906 28th Drive SE Bothell, Washington 98012 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Lottin, Claudine, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Lottin, Claudine, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al International Octrooibureau B.V., P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/16] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95307169.3 | 11.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | US19940321482 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: US 321482 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707221 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707221 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G01S7/529 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
G01S7/52033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/16] | Title | German: | Diagnostik-Ultraschall-System mit Regelung des Verstärkungsfaktors | [1996/16] | English: | Ultrasonic diagnostic system gain control | [1996/16] | French: | Appareil de diagnostic ultrasonore ayant un contrôle de gain ajustable | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2000 | BE | 26.01.2000 | CH | 26.01.2000 | ES | 26.01.2000 | GR | 26.01.2000 | LI | 26.01.2000 | NL | 26.01.2000 | SE | 26.01.2000 | DK | 26.04.2000 | PT | 26.04.2000 | IE | 11.10.2000 | LU | 11.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
GR | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
DK | 26.04.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
DK | 26.04.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
NL | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
ES | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
SE | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
IE | 11.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 26.01.2000 | |
BE | 26.01.2000 | ||
CH | 26.01.2000 | ||
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 26.01.2000 | |
LI | 26.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 01.05.2000 | |
LI | 01.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS63294841 ; | [Y]JPH06154227 ; | [Y]US4140107 (LANCEE CHARLES T, et al) [Y] 2,3,5 * column 1 - column 6; figure - *; | [Y]US4201982 (HUMPHRIES PETER E [CA]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 33; figure 3 *; | [A]US4356731 (MAHONY JOHN E) [A] 1* the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890327), vol. 13, no. 124, Database accession no. (C - 580), & JP63294841 A 19881201 (KAKIEMA CHIEMI) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-5,7,8 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940906), vol. 18, no. 476, Database accession no. (C - 1246), & JP6154227 A 19940603 (ISHIKAWA KO) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * |