blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0706951 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0706951



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 78
06.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.09.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
07.09.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.07.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.07.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
11.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
31.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
31.08.1998 Description Search / examination 1
31.08.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.1996 European search report Search / examination 3
05.01.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 14
07.11.1995 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.11.1995 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.10.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.10.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
11.10.1995 Description Search / examination 5
11.10.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.10.1995 Drawings Search / examination 3
11.10.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6