blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0706951
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3186954BGlobal Dossier 11.07.2001B2
JPH08192863 30.07.1996A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0706951Global Dossier 05.04.2000B1
EP0706951 17.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT191418T 15.04.2000T
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU699311B 03.12.1998B2
AU3316795 02.05.1996A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9504386 19.10.2004A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2160429 14.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1132166 02.10.1996A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516072D 11.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516072T 31.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0706951T 10.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2144104T 01.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR3033875T 30.11.2000T3
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX9504326 29.03.1997A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT706951E 29.09.2000E
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5489035 06.02.1996A
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9508664 22.05.1996B
Priority number Date
US32263694 13.10.1994